There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
09/29/2016Became Public Law No: 114-224. (TXT | PDF)
09/29/2016Signed by President.
09/26/2016Presented to President.
09/20/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5911)
08/30/2016Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/14/2016 without amendment. With written report No. 114-314.
04/26/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1979-1980)
04/12/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-486.
06/02/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
09/29/2016Became Public Law No: 114-224. (TXT | PDF)
09/29/2016Signed by President.
09/26/2016HousePresented to President.
09/21/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/20/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5911)
08/30/2016SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 586.
08/30/2016SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/14/2016 without amendment. With written report No. 114-314.
07/13/2016SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/27/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
04/26/2016-5:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/26/2016-5:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1979-1980)
04/26/2016-5:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2615.
04/26/2016-5:38pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1979-1981)
04/26/2016-5:38pmHouseMr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/12/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 370.
04/12/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-486.
03/01/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
03/01/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/04/2015HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3905)
06/02/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
06/02/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (76)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/16/2015
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/16/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/16/2015
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/16/2015
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 06/19/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/19/2015
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 06/19/2015
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/19/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/19/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/19/2015
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 06/19/2015
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/19/2015
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/19/2015
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/19/2015
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/19/2015
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/19/2015
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/19/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/19/2015
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/19/2015
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/19/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/19/2015
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/19/2015
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/19/2015
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/19/2015
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/19/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/19/2015
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/19/2015
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/19/2015
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/19/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/19/2015
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/19/2015
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/19/2015
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/19/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/19/2015
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/19/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/19/2015
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/19/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/19/2015
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/19/2015
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/19/2015
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/19/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/19/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/19/2015
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/19/2015
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/19/2015
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/19/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/19/2015
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/19/2015
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/19/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/19/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/19/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/23/2015
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/23/2015
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 06/23/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/23/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/23/2015
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/23/2015
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 06/23/2015
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 06/23/2015
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/23/2015
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/23/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/24/2015
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/24/2015
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/24/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/24/2015
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/24/2015
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/07/2015
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/07/2015
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 07/07/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/07/2015
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/07/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/07/2015
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/07/2015
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 07/07/2015
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/13/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/13/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/02/2015 Referred to
03/01/2016 Markup by
04/12/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-486
Senate Energy and Natural Resources04/27/2016 Referred to
07/13/2016 Markup by
08/30/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-314

No related bill information was received for H.R.2615.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for H.R.2615. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-224 (09/29/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on April 12, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission Act

(Sec. 2) This bill establishes the Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission to carry out activities to commemorate the 100th anniversary of the date the U.S. Virgin Islands became an unincorporated U.S. territory.

(Sec. 7) The Commission shall report annually to the President and Congress on Commission revenue and expenditures, including a list of each gift, bequest, or devise worth more than $250, and the identity of the donor.

(Sec. 8) The Inspector General of the Department of the Interior may audit the Commission, making the results available to Congress and the public.

(Sec. 10) The Commission shall terminate on September 30, 2018, or at an earlier date determined by the Commission after submitting its final report to Congress.

(Sec. 11) No federal funds are authorized or may be obligated to carry out this Act.