Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-61 (10/07/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on September 30, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This Act amends the Fair Minimum Wage Act of 2007 to prescribe a $0.40 per hour incremental increase in the transitional minimum wage for each American Samoa industry, beginning on September 30, 2015, and on September 30 triennially until the minimum wage applicable to American Samoa is equal to the minimum wage for the United States.

The deadline for the Government Accountability Office (GAO) report assessing the impact of minimum wage increases in American Samoa is changed from September 1, 2011, to April 1, 2017, with a subsequent report due by April 1, 2020.

The GAO shall also report on alternative ways of increasing the minimum wage in American Samoa to keep pace with the cost of living there and eventually equal the minimum wage for the United States.

This Act, and the amendments made by it, shall take effect as of September 29, 2015.