Text: H.R.2617 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-61 (10/07/2015)

 
[114th Congress Public Law 61]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]



[[Page 129 STAT. 545]]

Public Law 114-61
114th Congress

                                 An Act


 
    To amend the Fair Minimum Wage Act of 2007 to reduce a scheduled 
increase in the minimum wage applicable to American Samoa. <<NOTE: Oct. 
                        7, 2015 -  [H.R. 2617]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. MINIMUM WAGE FOR AMERICAN SAMOA.

    (a) Minimum Wage.--Paragraph (2) of section 8103(b) of the Fair 
Minimum Wage Act of 2007 (29 U.S.C. 206 note) is amended to read as 
follows:
            ``(2) the minimum wage applicable to American Samoa under 
        section 6(a)(1) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 (29 
        U.S.C. 206(a)(1)) shall be--
                    ``(A) the applicable wage rate in effect for each 
                industry and classification as of September 29, 2015; 
                and
                    ``(B) <<NOTE: Effective dates.>>  increased by $0.40 
                an hour (or such lesser amount as may be necessary to 
                equal the minimum wage under section 6(a)(1) of such 
                Act), beginning on September 30, 2015, and on September 
                30 of every third year thereafter, until the minimum 
                wage applicable to American Samoa under this paragraph 
                is equal to the minimum wage set forth in such 
                section.''.

    (b) GAO Reports.--Section 8104 of the Fair Minimum Wage Act of 2007 
(29 U.S.C. 206 note) is amended--
            (1) in subsection (a)--
                    (A) by striking ``September 1, 2011'' and inserting 
                ``April 1, 2017''; and
                    (B) by striking the second sentence and inserting 
                the following: ``The Government Accountability Office 
                shall submit a subsequent report not later than April 1, 
                2020.'';
            (2) in subsection (b), by striking ``the study under 
        subsection (a)'' and inserting ``any report under subsection 
        (a)''; and
            (3) by adding at the end the following:

    ``(c) Report on Alternative Methods of Increasing the Minimum Wage 
in American Samoa.--Not later than 1 year after the date of enactment of 
`An Act to amend the Fair Minimum Wage Act of 2007 to reduce a scheduled 
increase in the minimum wage applicable to American Samoa', the 
Government Accountability Office shall transmit to Congress a report on 
alternative ways of increasing the minimum wage in American Samoa to 
keep pace with the cost of living in American Samoa and to eventually 
equal the minimum wage set forth in section 6(a)(1) of the Fair Labor 
Standards Act of 1938 (29 U.S.C. 206(a)(1)).''.

[[Page 129 STAT. 546]]

    (c) <<NOTE: 29 USC 206 note.>>  Effective Date.--This Act, and the 
amendments made by this Act, shall take effect as of September 29, 2015.

    Approved October 7, 2015.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 2617:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 161 (2015):
            Sept. 28, considered and passed House.
            Sept. 30, considered and passed Senate, amended.
            Oct. 1, House concurred in Senate amendments.

                                  <all>

Share This