There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Regulatory Predictability for Business Growth Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require notice and comment for certain interpretive rules.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/03/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
11/03/2015Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law
06/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/03/2015Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/03/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/25/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 09/28/2015
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 10/26/2015
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/26/2015
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 02/10/2016
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 05/24/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary06/03/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law06/16/2015 Referred to
11/03/2015 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2631. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/03/2015)

Regulatory Predictability for Business Growth Act of 2015

This bill adds the definitions of "longstanding interpretive rule" and "revise" to the Administrative Procedure Act (APA). A longstanding interpretive rule is distinguished from an "interpretive rule" if it has been in effect for at least one year. If a rule is a longstanding interpretive rule, it remains subject to the general notice of proposed rulemaking and comment and publication provisions of the APA.