Committees: H.R.2647 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture06/04/2015 Referred to
06/17/2015 Markup by
06/25/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-185
House Natural Resources06/04/2015 Referred to
06/11/2015 Markup by
06/25/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-185
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands06/09/2015 Referred to
06/11/2015 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs06/09/2015 Referred to
06/11/2015 Discharged from
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry07/13/2015 Referred to
09/13/2016 Markup by
09/19/2016 Reported by