There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

POWER Act
Power Efficiency and Resiliency Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to modify the energy credit to provide greater incentives for industrial energy efficiency.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/04/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/04/2015Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/04/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/04/2015
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 06/04/2015
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/04/2015
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 06/04/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/04/2015
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 06/04/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 06/04/2015
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 06/04/2015
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/04/2015
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/09/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/09/2015
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/15/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/15/2015
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/16/2015
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 07/20/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/20/2015
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/23/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/17/2015
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 09/17/2015
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/17/2015
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/17/2015
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/22/2015
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/22/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/25/2015
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 09/29/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/01/2015
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 10/08/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/09/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/20/2015
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/20/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 10/22/2015
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 10/22/2015
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 10/28/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/28/2015
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 10/28/2015
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/28/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 11/17/2015
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 11/17/2015
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 11/17/2015
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/07/2015
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 12/07/2015
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/07/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/18/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/13/2016
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/13/2016
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/13/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/17/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/04/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2657. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/04/2015)

Power Efficiency and Resiliency Act or the POWER Act

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) allow a 30% energy tax credit for combined heat and power system property and increase the capacity limitations for such property, (2) extend until December 31, 2018, the placed-in-service deadline for such property, and (3) allow a 30% energy tax credit for waste heat to power property (property comprising a system generating electricity through the recovery of a qualified waste heat resource) placed in service before January 1, 2019.

Includes within the definition of "qualified waste heat resource": (1) exhaust heat or flared gas from any industrial process; (2) waste gas or industrial tail gas that would otherwise be flared, incinerated, or vented; and (3) a pressure drop in any gas for an industrial or commercial process. Excludes from such definition any heat resource from a process the primary purpose of which is the generation of electricity utilizing a fossil fuel or nuclear energy.