Text: H.R.2666 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (04/21/2016)

Calendar No. 431

114th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 2666


To prohibit the Federal Communications Commission from regulating the rates charged for broadband Internet access service.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

April 18, 2016

Received

April 20, 2016

Read the first time

April 21, 2016

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To prohibit the Federal Communications Commission from regulating the rates charged for broadband Internet access service.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “No Rate Regulation of Broadband Internet Access Act”.

SEC. 2. Regulation of broadband rates prohibited.

Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the Federal Communications Commission may not regulate the rates charged for broadband Internet access service.

SEC. 3. Exceptions.

Nothing in this Act shall be construed to affect the authority of the Commission to—

(1) condition receipt of universal service support under section 254 of the Communications Act of 1934 (47 U.S.C. 254) by a provider of broadband Internet access service on the regulation of the rates charged by such provider for the supported service;

(2) enforce subpart Y of part 64 of title 47, Code of Federal Regulations (relating to truth-in-billing requirements); or

(3) enforce section 8.9 of title 47, Code of Federal Regulations (relating to paid prioritization).

SEC. 4. Additional rule of construction.

For purposes of this Act, broadband Internet access service shall not be construed to include data roaming or interconnection.

SEC. 5. Definitions.

In this Act:

(1) BROADBAND INTERNET ACCESS SERVICE.—The term “broadband Internet access service” has the meaning given such term in the rules adopted in the Report and Order on Remand, Declaratory Ruling, and Order that was adopted by the Commission on February 26, 2015 (FCC 15–24).

(2) COMMISSION.—The term “Commission” means the Federal Communications Commission.

(3) RATE.—The term “rate” means the amount charged by a provider of broadband Internet access service for the delivery of broadband Internet traffic.

(4) REGULATION.—The term “regulation” or “regulate” means, with respect to a rate, the use by the Commission of rulemaking or enforcement authority to establish, declare, or review the reasonableness of such rate.

Passed the House of Representatives April 15, 2016.

Attest:
Karen L. Haas,

Clerk  


Calendar No. 431

114th CONGRESS
     2d Session
H. R. 2666

AN ACT
To prohibit the Federal Communications Commission from regulating the rates charged for broadband Internet access service.

April 21, 2016
Read the second time and placed on the calendar