There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the arboretum at the Hunter Holmes McGuire VA Medical Center in Richmond, Virginia, as the "Phyllis E. Galanti Arboretum".


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/18/2015Became Public Law No: 114-103. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2015Signed by President.
12/11/2015Presented to President.
12/10/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/10/2015Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8618)
12/08/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9063)
12/08/2015Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.(consideration: CR H9063)
06/09/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/18/2015Became Public Law No: 114-103. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2015Signed by President.
12/11/2015HousePresented to President.
12/11/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/10/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/10/2015SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8618)
12/09/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
12/08/2015-5:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/08/2015-5:31pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9063)
12/08/2015-5:31pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9063)
12/08/2015-5:31pmHouseMr. Miller (FL) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. (consideration: CR H9063)
12/08/2015HouseCommittee on Veterans' Affairs discharged. (consideration: CR H9063)
06/30/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/09/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/09/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/09/2015 Referred to
12/08/2015 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health06/30/2015 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs12/09/2015 Referred to
12/10/2015 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2693. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-103 (12/18/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 2) This bill designates the arboretum at the Hunter Holmes McGuire VA Medical Center in Richmond, Virginia, as the Phyllis E. Galanti Arboretum.