There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Automatic Voter Registration Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Voter Registration Act of 1993 to require each State to ensure that each individual who provides identifying information to the State motor vehicle authority is automatically registered to vote in elections for Federal office held in the State unless the individual does not meet the eligibility requirements for registering to vote in such elections or declines to be registered to vote in such elections, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/09/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
06/09/2015Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/09/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (108)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 06/09/2015
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/09/2015
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 06/09/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/11/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/11/2015
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/11/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/12/2015
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/16/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/16/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/16/2015
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/16/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/16/2015
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/16/2015
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/16/2015
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/16/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 06/16/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/16/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/16/2015
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/16/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/16/2015
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/17/2015
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/17/2015
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 07/15/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/15/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/15/2015
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/21/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/10/2015
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 09/29/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 12/15/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/13/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/11/2016
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/11/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/11/2016
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/11/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/12/2016
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/12/2016
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/14/2016
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/14/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/14/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/14/2016
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/14/2016
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/18/2016
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/21/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/21/2016
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/21/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/29/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/29/2016
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/11/2016
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/11/2016
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/11/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/11/2016
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 05/16/2016
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/16/2016
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/16/2016
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/24/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/24/2016
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/26/2016
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/11/2016
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/12/2016
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/12/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/13/2016
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/14/2016
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/14/2016
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 07/14/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/08/2016
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/08/2016
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 09/28/2016
Rep. Graham, Gwen [D-FL-2] 11/15/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 12/08/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Committee on House Administration06/09/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2694.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2694. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/09/2015)

Automatic Voter Registration Act

This bill amends the National Voter Registration Act of 1993 to require state motor vehicle authorities (MVAs), upon receiving certain identifying information with respect to any individual requesting MVA services, to transmit it to the appropriate state election official.

The appropriate state election official shall then notify the individual that unless he or she notifies the official, before 21 calendar days elapse after issuance of the notification, that the individual declines to be registered to vote in federal elections in the state, the individual shall be considered to have submitted a completed voter registration application and be considered automatically registered unless:

  • the official determines that the individual does not meet voter registration eligibility requirements, or
  • the individual is already registered to vote.

A state may not use any identifying information regarding an individual's citizenship status for any purpose other than determining whether the individual is eligible to vote in federal elections.