There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Tanning Tax Repeal Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the excise tax on indoor tanning services.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/09/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/09/2015Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/09/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (111)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/09/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 06/10/2015
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/10/2015
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/10/2015
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 06/11/2015
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/12/2015
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/15/2015
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 06/17/2015
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/23/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/25/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 06/25/2015
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/25/2015
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 06/25/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/07/2015
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/08/2015
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 07/08/2015
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 07/09/2015
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/13/2015
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 07/21/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/21/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/21/2015
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/21/2015
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 07/21/2015
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/22/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/22/2015
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/22/2015
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/23/2015
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 07/23/2015
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/28/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/28/2015
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/29/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/29/2015
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 08/04/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/09/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 09/09/2015
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/10/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/16/2015
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 09/18/2015
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 09/29/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/30/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 09/30/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/01/2015
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 10/06/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 10/06/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 10/07/2015
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/07/2015
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 10/08/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 10/08/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 10/20/2015
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 10/20/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 10/20/2015
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/20/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 11/04/2015
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 11/05/2015
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/05/2015
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 11/05/2015
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/16/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/16/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 11/16/2015
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/18/2015
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/18/2015
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 11/18/2015
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 12/01/2015
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 12/08/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 12/11/2015
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 12/18/2015
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 12/18/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 02/03/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/03/2016
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 02/03/2016
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/04/2016
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/10/2016
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 02/12/2016
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 02/12/2016
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/24/2016
Rep. Hardy, Cresent [R-NV-4] 02/24/2016
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/26/2016
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/14/2016
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/14/2016
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/14/2016
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 04/18/2016
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/20/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/21/2016
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/26/2016
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/26/2016
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/26/2016
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/23/2016
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/26/2016
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/08/2016
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/09/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/14/2016
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/14/2016
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/05/2016
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/06/2016
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 07/11/2016
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 09/21/2016
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 09/26/2016
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/28/2016
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 12/08/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/09/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2698.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2698. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/09/2015)

Tanning Tax Repeal Act of 2015

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal the 10% excise tax on indoor tanning services.