There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Cancer Drug Coverage Parity Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to require group and individual health insurance coverage and group health plans to provide for coverage of oral anticancer drugs on terms no less favorable than the coverage provided for anticancer medications administered by a health care provider.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/11/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/12/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/11/2015Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/11/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (123)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/11/2015
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 06/11/2015
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/11/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 06/11/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/11/2015
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 06/11/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/11/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 06/11/2015
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 06/11/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 06/11/2015
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 06/11/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/15/2015
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/15/2015
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/17/2015
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 06/17/2015
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/07/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/07/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/09/2015
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/09/2015
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 07/13/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/13/2015
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/28/2015
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1] 07/28/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/09/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/09/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 09/16/2015
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/16/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/25/2015
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/25/2015
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/25/2015
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/25/2015
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 09/28/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/28/2015
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 09/30/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/30/2015
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/16/2015
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/18/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/18/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 12/01/2015
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 12/01/2015
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 12/11/2015
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 12/11/2015
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/15/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 12/15/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/14/2016
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/14/2016
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 04/12/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/12/2016
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/12/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/12/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/12/2016
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/12/2016
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/18/2016
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/18/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/18/2016
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/18/2016
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/19/2016
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/19/2016
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/19/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/19/2016
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 04/27/2016
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/27/2016
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/27/2016
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/27/2016
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/27/2016
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/27/2016
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/27/2016
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/27/2016
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/27/2016
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/27/2016
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/28/2016
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/28/2016
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/29/2016
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 04/29/2016
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/11/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/11/2016
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/17/2016
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/17/2016
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/18/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/18/2016
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/23/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/23/2016
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/24/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/24/2016
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/25/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/25/2016
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 06/08/2016
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/08/2016
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/08/2016
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/08/2016
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/13/2016
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 06/13/2016
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 06/13/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/13/2016
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/13/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 06/13/2016
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/14/2016
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/14/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/16/2016
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 06/16/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/11/2016
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/11/2016
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/11/2016
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/11/2016
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/12/2016
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/12/2016
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/07/2016
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 09/07/2016
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/07/2016
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/07/2016
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/07/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 09/07/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/07/2016
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/07/2016
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/07/2016
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 09/08/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/08/2016
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 09/22/2016
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/22/2016
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/26/2016
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/26/2016
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 09/26/2016
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/26/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/11/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/12/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2739. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/11/2015)

Cancer Drug Coverage Parity Act of 2015

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to require a group or individual health plan that covers anticancer medications administered by a health care provider to provide no less favorable coverage for anticancer medications administered by a patient. A plan may apply to patient-administered anticancer medications only the cost-sharing and limitations that apply to anticancer medications administered by a health care provider.

These requirements apply to medication approved by the Food and Drug Administration that is prescribed based on a finding by the treating physician that the medication is medically necessary for cancer treatment and is clinically appropriate in terms of type, frequency, extent site, and duration.

To comply with these requirements, health plans may not, for anticancer medications: (1) change or replace benefits to increase out-of-pocket costs; (2) reclassify benefits to increase costs; or (3) apply more restrictive limitations to orally administered medications than to intravenously administered or injected medications.