There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Standard Merger and Acquisition Reviews Through Equal Rules Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Clayton Act and the Federal Trade Commission Act to provide that the Federal Trade Commission shall exercise authority with respect to mergers only under the Clayton Act and only in the same procedural manner as the Attorney General exercises such authority.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/23/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 235 - 171 (Roll no. 137).(text: CR H1560-1561)
03/14/2016Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-449.
06/12/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
04/04/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
03/23/2016-11:08amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/23/2016-11:08amHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 235 - 171 (Roll no. 137). (text: CR H1560-1561)
03/23/2016-11:01amHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 174 - 235 (Roll no. 136). (consideration: CR H1568)
03/23/2016-10:40amHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H1568)
03/23/2016-10:32amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with ten minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to prohibit mergers that would increase the costs of pharmaceutical drugs.
03/23/2016-10:32amHouseMr. Doggett moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on the Judiciary. (consideration: CR H1567-1568; text: CR H1567)
03/23/2016-10:31amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H1567)
03/23/2016-9:42amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2745.
03/23/2016-9:40amHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2745 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. On any legislative day during the period from March 24, 2016, through April 11, 2016, the Journal of the proceedings of the previous day shall be considered as approved; and the Chair may at any time declare the house adjourned to meet at a date and time, within the limits of clause 4, section 5, of article I of the Constitution, to be announced by the Chair in declaring the adjournment.
03/23/2016-9:40amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 653. (consideration: CR H1560-1569)
03/22/2016-3:16pmHouseRule H. Res. 653 passed House.
03/21/2016-6:58pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 653 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2745 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. On any legislative day during the period from March 24, 2016, through April 11, 2016, the Journal of the proceedings of the previous day shall be considered as approved; and the Chair may at any time declare the house adjourned to meet at a date and time, within the limits of clause 4, section 5, of article I of the Constitution, to be announced by the Chair in declaring the adjournment.
03/14/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 344.
03/14/2016HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-449.
09/30/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 10.
09/30/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/29/2015HouseSubcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Discharged.
07/01/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/12/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
06/12/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 06/18/2015
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 02/08/2016
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/23/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/12/2015 Referred to
09/30/2015 Markup by
03/14/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-449
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law07/01/2015 Referred to
09/29/2015 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary04/04/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2745. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/23/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Standard Merger and Acquisition Reviews Through Equal Rules Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Clayton Act with respect to notice to a state by the Department of Justice (DOJ) about federal actions brought for violations of antitrust laws. Currently DOJ must:

  • notify a state attorney general about an antitrust action regarding which DOJ has reason to believe that the state attorney general would also be entitled to bring an action based substantially on the same alleged violation of the antitrust laws; and
  • upon request make available to the state attorney general, to the extent permitted by law, any investigative files or other materials which are or may be relevant or material to the actual or potential cause of action.

The Federal Trade Commission (FTC) shall exercise the same authority and procedures as DOJ under the Clayton Act if the FTC has brought an action under Section 7 of the same Act with respect to the prohibition against acquisition by one corporation of the stock of another (merger) that may substantially lessen competition or tend to create a monopoly.

Also in cases brought by the FTC that result in final judgments against a defendant, those judgments shall be prima facie evidence of antitrust violations under substantially similar facts in actions brought by other parties.

The statute of limitations shall be tolled during a proceeding brought by the FTC under Section 7, and for one year thereafter, for any private and state rights of action based on the conduct in question during the proceeding.

The FTC shall enforce compliance with section 7 in the same manner as DOJ in acting to prevent or restrain antitrust violations. The FTC shall enforce a consent order, however, in the same manner it does already.

(Sec. 3) The Federal Trade Commission Act (FTCA) is amended to exclude proposed mergers, acquisitions, joint ventures, or similar transactions from ordinary FTC proceedings, except in cases where the FTC approves an agreement with the parties to the transaction that contains a consent order.

U.S. district courts shall have jurisdiction to issue writs of mandamus commanding compliance with the FTCA or any FTC order, if the FTC applies to such courts with respect to any activity related to consummation of a merger, acquisition, joint venture, or similar transaction that may result in an unfair method of competition.