There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Mental Health Access Improvement Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for the coverage of marriage and family therapist services and mental health counselor services under part B of the Medicare program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/12/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
06/23/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/19/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/12/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 06/12/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/29/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/29/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/08/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/08/2015
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/11/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/15/2015
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/24/2015
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 09/24/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/24/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/28/2015
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/30/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/30/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/30/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/30/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/06/2015
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/07/2015
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/07/2015
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 10/07/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/08/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/21/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/21/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/21/2015
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/21/2015
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/21/2015
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 10/27/2015
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/28/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 11/16/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 11/17/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/19/2015
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 11/19/2015
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/07/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/09/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/09/2015
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 12/09/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/15/2015
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 12/15/2015
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 01/06/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/23/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/24/2016
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/15/2016
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 04/20/2016
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 04/20/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/20/2016
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/27/2016
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/27/2016
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 04/28/2016
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 05/03/2016
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/03/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/12/2016
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/08/2016
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/13/2016
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/12/2016
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 09/28/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/14/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/16/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/12/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/19/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/12/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health06/23/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2759. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/12/2015)

Mental Health Access Improvement Act of 2015

Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to cover marriage and family therapist services and mental health counselor services under Medicare part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance), particularly those provided in rural health clinics, federally qualified health centers, and in hospice programs.

Amends Medicare part E (Miscellaneous) to exclude such services from the skilled nursing facility prospective payment system.

Authorizes marriage and family therapists and mental health counselors to develop discharge plans for post-hospital services.