There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Cross-Border Rail Security Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

Cross-Border Rail Security Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Cross-Border Rail Security Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection to submit a report on cross-border rail security, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/28/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 0 (Roll no. 520).(text: CR H6284)
07/28/2015Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-233.
06/15/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
09/29/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/28/2015-7:05pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 0 (Roll no. 520). (text: CR H6284)
09/28/2015-7:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2015-6:56pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6291)
09/28/2015-5:15pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/28/2015-5:09pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2786.
09/28/2015-5:09pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6284-6285)
09/28/2015-5:09pmHouseMs. McSally moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/28/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 176.
07/28/2015HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-233.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/25/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/25/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/23/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/23/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/15/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
06/15/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/15/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security06/15/2015 Referred to
06/25/2015 Markup by
07/28/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-233
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security06/23/2015 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Transportation Security06/23/2015 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/29/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2786.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2786. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/28/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Cross-Border Rail Security Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) to report to Congress on:

  • the number of high-risk rail shipments annually entering the United States;
  • the status of radiation detection units at each rail crossing on the northern and southern land borders of the United States;
  • an assessment of whether additional radiation detection equipment is necessary to ensure that all high-risk cross-border rail shipments are examined with appropriate equipment; and
  • a plan for ensuring that all relevant CBP personnel receive adequate training and guidance on the proper use of CBP's Automated Targeting System for such shipments, the use of appropriate radiation detection equipment for shipment examination, and requirements for recording examination results.

The General Accountability Office shall periodically audit CBP operations at rail crossings on such borders to ensure that rail shipments are targeted and examined and that the examination results are properly documented.