There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to recoup bonuses and awards paid to employees of the Department of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
03/02/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1507)
03/02/2015Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
03/02/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 114-32, Part I.
01/12/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
03/03/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/02/2015-6:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/02/2015-6:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1507)
03/02/2015-6:57pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1511)
03/02/2015-5:15pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Miller (FL) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
03/02/2015-5:03pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 280.
03/02/2015-5:03pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1507-1509)
03/02/2015-5:03pmHouseMr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/02/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 21.
03/02/2015HouseCommittee on Oversight and Government discharged.
03/02/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 114-32, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/12/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/12/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/27/2015HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/12/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/12/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/12/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/12/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/12/2015 Referred to
01/27/2015 Hearings by
02/12/2015 Markup by
03/02/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-32
House Oversight and Government Reform01/12/2015 Referred to
03/02/2015 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs03/03/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.280. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/02/2015)

Authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to issue an order directing a VA employee to repay the amount, or a portion of the amount, of an award or bonus paid to the employee if: (1) the VA determines that such repayment is appropriate, and (2) the employee is afforded notice and an opportunity for a hearing conducted by another federal agency. Makes such repayment decisions final and unreviewable.

Makes this Act applicable to awards or bonuses paid before, on, or after the date of this Act's enactment.