There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Save Oak Flat Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal section 3003 of the the Carl Levin and Howard P. "Buck" McKeon National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2015.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/17/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
07/01/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/01/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/01/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/17/2015Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/17/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/17/2015
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 06/17/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/17/2015
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/17/2015
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 06/17/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 06/17/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/17/2015
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/17/2015
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 06/17/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/17/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/17/2015
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 06/17/2015
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 06/17/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/17/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/07/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/07/2015
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/08/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 07/21/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/21/2015
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/21/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/21/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/21/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/21/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/21/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/27/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 07/27/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/27/2015
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/31/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/31/2015
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/09/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/16/2015
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 09/18/2015
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/18/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/25/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/20/2015
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/26/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 11/05/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/05/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/05/2015
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/01/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/03/2016
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/15/2016
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 05/10/2016
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/10/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources06/17/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources07/01/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands07/01/2015 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs07/01/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2811. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/17/2015)

Save Oak Flat Act

This bill repeals the provisions under the Carl Levin and Howard P. "Buck" McKeon National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2015 providing for a land exchange between the Department of Agriculture and Resolution Copper Mining, LLC. Under the provisions of that Act, 2,422 acres of Forest Service land located in Pinal County, Arizona, are to be exchanged for various parcels of land owned by Resolution Copper.