There are 8 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Reauthorization Act of 2015

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Reauthorization Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Reauthorization Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Reauthorization Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Reauthorization Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Act of 2005, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
12/18/2015Became Public Law No: 114-104. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2015Signed by President.
12/18/2015Presented to President.
12/16/2015Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 0 (Roll no. 695).(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H9333)
12/09/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8560; text as passed Senate: CR S8560)
12/03/2015Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/08/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5801)
09/08/2015Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-242.
06/18/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (28)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/18/2015Became Public Law No: 114-104. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2015Signed by President.
12/18/2015HousePresented to President.
12/16/2015-10:31amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/16/2015-10:31amHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 0 (Roll no. 695). (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H9333)
12/16/2015-9:29amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/16/2015-9:15amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and concur in the Senate amendment to H.R. 2820.
12/16/2015-9:15amHouseMr. Pitts moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9333-9335, H9339)
12/10/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/09/2015SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8560; text as passed Senate: CR S8560)
12/03/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 311.
12/03/2015SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
11/18/2015SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
09/09/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
09/08/2015-4:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/08/2015-4:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5801)
09/08/2015-4:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2820.
09/08/2015-4:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5801-5804)
09/08/2015-4:38pmHouseMr. Guthrie moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/08/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 183.
09/08/2015HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-242.
07/29/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/29/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/23/2015HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
07/23/2015HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
06/19/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/18/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
06/18/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (22)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/18/2015 Referred to
07/29/2015 Markup by
09/08/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-242
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/19/2015 Referred to
07/23/2015 Markup by
07/23/2015 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/09/2015 Referred to
11/18/2015 Markup by
12/03/2015 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.2820. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-104 (12/18/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on December 3, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Reauthorization Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act and the Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Act of 2005 to revise and extend through FY2020 the C.W. Bill Young Cell Transplantation Program and the National Cord Blood Inventory program. (These programs help match patients in need of a transplant with unrelated bone marrow and cord blood donors.)

The Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) must review the state of the science of using adult stem cells and birthing tissues to develop new therapies and consider the inclusion of new therapies in the C.W. Bill Young Cell Transplantation Program.

(Sec. 3) Requirements for HHS contracts under the Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Act of 2005 are revised.

(Sec. 4) HHS must determine whether to include peripheral blood stem cells and umbilical cord blood in the definition of human organ.