Committees: H.R.2820 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/18/2015 Referred to
07/29/2015 Markup by
09/08/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-242
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/19/2015 Referred to
07/23/2015 Markup by
07/23/2015 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/09/2015 Referred to
11/18/2015 Markup by
12/03/2015 Reported by