There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Border Jobs for Veterans Act of 2015

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Border Jobs for Veterans Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Border Jobs for Veterans Act of 2015

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Border Jobs for Veterans Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To actively recruit members of the Armed Forces who are separating from military service to serve as Customs and Border Protection Officers.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
10/16/2015Became Public Law No: 114-68. (TXT | PDF)
10/16/2015Signed by President.
10/07/2015Presented to President.
10/01/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7065-7067)
09/28/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 0 (Roll no. 519).(text: CR H6285)
06/18/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
10/16/2015Became Public Law No: 114-68. (TXT | PDF)
10/16/2015Signed by President.
10/07/2015HousePresented to President.
10/01/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/01/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7065-7067)
09/29/2015SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/28/2015-6:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2015-6:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 0 (Roll no. 519). (text: CR H6285)
09/28/2015-6:32pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6290-6291)
09/28/2015-5:23pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/28/2015-5:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2835.
09/28/2015-5:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6285-6287)
09/28/2015-5:16pmHouseMs. McSally moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/13/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/29/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/29/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/18/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/18/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/18/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/18/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security06/18/2015 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security06/29/2015 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency06/29/2015 Referred to
House Armed Services06/18/2015 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel08/13/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2835. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-68 (10/16/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on September 28, 2015. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Border Jobs for Veterans Act of 2015

(Sec. 3) Directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to consider the expedited hiring of qualified candidates who have the ability to perform the essential functions of the position of a Customs and Border Protection (CBP) officer and who are eligible for a veterans recruitment appointment.

(Sec. 4) Requires DHS to enhance DHS efforts to recruit members of the Armed Forces who are separating from military service to serve as CBP officers. Requires such enhanced recruiting efforts to:

  • include CBP officer opportunities in relevant job assistance efforts under the Transition Assistance Program;
  • place CBP officials or other relevant DHS officials at recruiting events and jobs fairs involving separating members of the Armed Forces;
  • provide opportunities for local CBP field offices to partner with military bases in the region;
  • include outreach efforts to educate members of the Armed Forces with qualifications that are transferable to CBP officer requirements;
  • identify shared activities and opportunities for reciprocity related to steps in hiring CBP officers with the goal of minimizing the time required to hire qualified applicants;
  • ensure the streamlined interagency transfer of relevant background investigations and security clearances; and
  • include other elements to ensure that separating members of the Armed Forces are aware of opportunities to fill vacant CBP officer positions.

(Sec. 5) Directs DHS to report to Congress on DHS efforts to hire members of the Armed Forces who are separating from military service as CBP officers.