There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Time Off to Vote Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide employees with 2 hours of paid leave in order to vote in Federal elections.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/25/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
11/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
06/25/2015Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/25/2015
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/25/2015
Resident Commissioner Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/25/2015
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/25/2015
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/25/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/25/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/25/2015
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/09/2015
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 07/09/2015
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/09/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/07/2016
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/07/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/15/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and the Workforce06/25/2015 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections11/16/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2887.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2887. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/25/2015)

Time Off to Vote Act

Entitles an employee to two hours of paid leave on the day of any federal election in order to vote.

Gives the employer the right to determine the two-hour-period, excluding any lunch break or other break.

Prohibits the loss of benefits for any employee taking such leave under this Act.

Makes it unlawful for any employer to interfere with, restrain, or deny the exercise of or the attempt to exercise, the right to take leave under this Act, or to discriminate against an employee in any manner for taking leave under this Act.

Makes it unlawful for any employer to discharge or in any other manner discriminate against any individual for: (1) opposing any practice made unlawful by this Act; (2) filing any charge, or instituting or causing to be instituted any proceeding, under or related to this Act; or (3) testifying or preparing to testifying in any inquiry or proceeding relating to any leave provided under this Act.

Specifies the penalties for any employer who violates this Act.