There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

National Bison Legacy Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Bison Legacy Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

National Bison Legacy Act

Short Titles as Introduced

National Bison Legacy Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To adopt the bison as the national mammal of the United States.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
05/09/2016Became Public Law No: 114-152. (TXT | PDF)
05/09/2016Signed by President.
04/29/2016Presented to President.
04/28/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2576)
04/26/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1978)
04/12/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-483.
06/25/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/09/2016Became Public Law No: 114-152. (TXT | PDF)
05/09/2016Signed by President.
04/29/2016HousePresented to President.
04/29/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/28/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2576)
04/27/2016SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 438.
04/26/2016-5:37pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/26/2016-5:37pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1978)
04/26/2016-5:30pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2908.
04/26/2016-5:30pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1978-1979)
04/26/2016-5:30pmHouseMr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/12/2016HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 104.
04/12/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-483.
03/01/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/01/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
06/25/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
06/25/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (14)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/25/2015 Referred to
03/01/2016 Markup by
04/12/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-483

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.2908. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-152 (05/09/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on April 12, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

National Bison Legacy Act

(Sec. 3) This bill adopts the North American bison as the national mammal of the United States.