There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Centennial Monetary Commission Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Centennial Monetary Commission Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a commission to examine the United States monetary policy, evaluate alternative monetary regimes, and recommend a course for monetary policy going forward.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/16/2015Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-331.
06/25/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
11/16/2015Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 252.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/16/2015Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-331.
07/29/2015Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 35 - 22.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/29/2015Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/22/2015Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade
06/25/2015Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (32)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services06/25/2015 Referred to
07/29/2015 Markup by
11/16/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-331
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade07/22/2015 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2912. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (11/16/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Centennial Monetary Commission Act of 2015

(Sec. 3) This bill establishes the Centennial Monetary Commission to: (1) examine how U.S. monetary policy since the creation of the Federal Reserve Board in 1913 has affected the performance of the U.S. economy in terms of output, employment, prices, and financial stability over time; (2) evaluate various operational regimes under which the Board and the Federal Open Market Committee may conduct monetary policy in terms achieving the maximum sustainable level of output and employment and price stability over the long term; (3) evaluate the use of macro-prudential supervision and regulation and of the lender-of-last-resort function of the Board as tools of monetary policy in terms of achieving the maximum sustainable level of output and employment and price stability over the long term; and (4) recommend a course for U.S. monetary policy going forward.

The Commission shall submit to Congress and make publicly available, by December 1, 2016, a report containing a statement of its findings and conclusions.

(Sec. 8) The Commission shall terminate on June 1, 2017.