There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Cuban Military Transparency Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To strengthen support for the Cuban people and prohibit financial transactions with the Cuban military, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/25/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/25/2015Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2015Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2015Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/25/2015
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Hardy, Cresent [R-NV-4]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 06/25/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/07/2015
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 07/07/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 07/07/2015
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 07/08/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/08/2015
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/08/2015
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/09/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/09/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/09/2015
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 07/13/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/14/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/14/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/15/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/21/2015
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/21/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 07/22/2015
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/18/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/25/2015 Referred to
House Financial Services06/25/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2937. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/25/2015)

Cuban Military Transparency Act

This bill prohibits a U.S. person from engaging in any financial transaction with or transfer of funds to:

  • the Ministry of the Revolutionary Armed Forces of Cuba or the Ministry of the Interior of Cuba (or any of their subdivisions);
  • a senior member of such Ministries;
  • any agency, instrumentality, or other entity that is more than 25% owned, or that is operated or controlled by, such a Ministry; or
  • any individual or entity for the purpose of avoiding a prohibited financial transaction or transfer of funds that is for the benefit of that individual or entity.

Such prohibitions shall not apply to:

  • the sale to Cuba of agricultural commodities, medicines, and medical devices;
  • a remittance to an immediate family member;
  • assistance in furtherance of democracy-building efforts for Cuba;
  • payments in furtherance of the lease agreement or other financial transactions necessary for maintenance and improvements of the military base at Guantanamo Bay; or
  • customary and routine financial transactions necessary for the maintenance or regular duties of the U.S. Interests Section in Havana, including outreach to the pro-democracy opposition.

A person that violates or attempts to violate such prohibitions shall be subject to specified penalties under the International Emergency Economic Powers Act.

The Department of State rewards program under the State Department Basic Authorities Act of 1956 shall include rewards for information leading to the arrest or conviction in any country of any individual responsible for or aiding in the February 1996 attack on the aircraft of U.S. persons in international waters by the Cuban military.

The Attorney General shall seek to coordinate with the International Criminal Police Organization (INTERPOL) to pursue the location and arrest of U.S. fugitives in Cuba, including current and former members of the Cuban military.