There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Sensenbrenner-Scott Over-Criminalization Task Force Safe, Accountable, Fair, Effective Justice Reinvestment Act of 2015
Sensenbrenner-Scott SAFE Justice Reinvestment Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve public safety, accountability, transparency, and respect for federalism in Federal criminal law by applying the findings of the bipartisan Over-Criminalization Task Force and evidence-based reforms already made by some States, and reinvesting the resulting savings from doing so in additional evidence-based criminal justice strategies that are proven to reduce recidivism and crime, and the burden of the criminal justice system on the taxpayer.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/25/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
07/09/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/26/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/25/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2015Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 06/25/2015
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/25/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/09/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/09/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/09/2015
Resident Commissioner Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/09/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/13/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 07/13/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/13/2015
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/13/2015
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/15/2015
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/15/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/15/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/15/2015
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 07/21/2015
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/21/2015
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 07/28/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/28/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/29/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/29/2015
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 09/28/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/30/2015
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/30/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/30/2015
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/30/2015
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/30/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 10/01/2015
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/01/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 10/01/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/01/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/09/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/09/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 10/09/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/09/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 10/21/2015
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 10/21/2015
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 11/02/2015
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 11/02/2015
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/14/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/14/2016
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 09/12/2016
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/12/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary06/25/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations07/09/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce06/25/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/26/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2944. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/25/2015)

Sensenbrenner-Scott Over-Criminalization Task Force Safe, Accountable, Fair, Effective Justice Reinvestment Act of 2015 or the Sensenbrenner-Scott SAFE Justice Reinvestment Act of 2015

This bill requires the Department of Justice (DOJ) to: (1) compile and publish federal law violations with criminal penalties, (2) reduce over-federalization of criminal conduct and over-incarceration due to pretrial detention, (3) create a online complaint process to challenge prosecutions and (4) create training and best practices for prosecutors and law enforcement officers that reduce the inaccuracy and unreliability of evidence in criminal cases.

It prohibits sentencing courts from considering defendant's acquitted conduct and grants discretion to disregard manipulated conduct involving the Controlled Substances Act.

It reauthorizes the Innocence Protection Act of 2001 for FY2016-FY2021.

The bill expands pre-judgment probation, safety valve, and compassionate release eligibility.

It creates problem-solving courts, establishes a presumption of probation for certain non-violent first-time offenders, and limits prior drug offenses that trigger enhanced mandatory minimum prison terms.

It limits application of drug offense mandatory minimums to drug trafficking organization leaders, organizers, or employees. (Drug offenses include unlawful import, export, manufacture, or distribution of, or possession with intent to distribute a controlled substance.)

It also reduces from life to 35 years the maximum mandatory minimum for certain drug offenses.

The Fair Sentencing Act of 2010 applies retroactively to permit resentencing of a convicted crack cocaine offender sentenced before August 3, 2010.

DOJ must develop a post-sentencing risk and needs assessment system.

The Bureau of Prisons (BOP) must provide residential substance abuse treatment to all eligible offenders.

The bill establishes a standardized graduated sanctioning system for supervised release or probation violations. It eliminates mandatory revocation for certain minor violations and creates a performance-incentive funding program for judicial districts.

BOP may grant 54 days of good time credit regardless of satisfactory GED progress. Probation officers may award positive reinforcement (e.g. discharge credits) for compliance with terms of supervision.

The bill adds one non-voting, public defender member to the U.S. Sentencing Commission.