There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Telehealth Parity Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for an incremental expansion of telehealth coverage under the Medicare program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/07/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
07/13/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/10/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/07/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/07/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/07/2015Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/07/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 07/07/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 07/07/2015
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/07/2015
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/14/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/15/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 07/15/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 07/23/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/23/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/28/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 07/29/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/29/2015
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/29/2015
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/08/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/08/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/08/2015
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/09/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/09/2015
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/10/2015
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/16/2015
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/17/2015
Rep. Graham, Gwen [D-FL-2] 09/22/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 10/06/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/22/2015
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 11/02/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/02/2015
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 11/02/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/03/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/24/2016
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/23/2016
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/12/2016
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/12/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/12/2016
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 04/12/2016
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/12/2016
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 04/12/2016
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/12/2016
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 04/12/2016
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/14/2016
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/14/2016
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/14/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/14/2016
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/14/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/14/2016
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/19/2016
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/19/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/26/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/26/2016
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/26/2016
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 04/28/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/11/2016
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/11/2016
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 05/11/2016
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/18/2016
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/26/2016
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/26/2016
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/26/2016
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/09/2016
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/09/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/09/2016
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 06/13/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 07/01/2016
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/06/2016
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/13/2016
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/14/2016
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 09/08/2016
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 09/20/2016
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 09/28/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/07/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/10/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/07/2015 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health07/13/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2948.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2948. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/07/2015)

Medicare Telehealth Parity Act of 2015

Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to expand telehealth coverage in three phases.

Extends the term "originating site," for telehealth service payment purposes, to additional sites, including any federally qualified health center and any rural health clinic, at which the eligible telehealth individual is located at the time the service is furnished via a telecommunications system.

Prohibits application of the originating site facility fee to the additional sites.

Authorizes additional telehealth providers, including a certified diabetes educator or licensed respiratory therapist, audiologist, occupational therapist, physical therapist, or speech language pathologist.

Authorizes the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to develop payment methods to apply in the case of anyone who would be an eligible telehealth individual except that the telehealth services are furnished at a site other than an originating site.

Extends Medicare coverage to remote patient management services for certain chronic health conditions.

Authorizes home telehealth sites as additional originating sites.

Requires the monthly fee or other basis of payment for physicians' services to individuals with end stage renal disease (ESRD) to allow for a patient-specific waiver process to permit a physician, clinical nurse specialist, nurse practitioner, or physician's assistant to request a waiver of face-to-face visit requirements for home dialysis of ESRD patients.

Requires all ESRD patients receiving home dialysis to receive a face-to-face examination at least once every three consecutive months and, in the intervening months, to receive a monthly clinical assessment which may be furnished, if the patient so chooses, via remote monitoring by a physician, clinical nurse specialist, nurse practitioner, or physician's assistant.

Directs HHS, in determining the component of a physician's fee corresponding to practice expense relative value units for diagnostic tests provided remotely, to include in direct costs of supplies and equipment the costs of the diagnostic device, clinical systems (including hardware and software), information transmission, and device delivery and installation.

Directs the Government Accountability Office to study the effectiveness of using specified telehealth services between therapy providers and patients, any associated savings, and the potential for greater use of telehealth services for other forms of therapy.