There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Historic Preservation program.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/12/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5286)
05/10/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-549.
01/13/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
09/13/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
09/12/2016-4:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2016-4:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5286)
09/12/2016-4:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 295.
09/12/2016-4:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5286-5287)
09/12/2016-4:33pmHouseMrs. Radewagen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/10/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 424.
05/10/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-549.
03/16/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
03/16/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/15/2016HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
03/15/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/11/2016HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
03/02/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/13/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/13/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/13/2015
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 01/14/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 01/26/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 03/01/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/22/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/13/2015 Referred to
03/16/2016 Markup by
05/10/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-549
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands03/02/2015 Referred to
02/11/2016 Hearings by
03/15/2016 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/13/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.295. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/12/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on May 10, 2016. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill amends the Omnibus Parks and Public Lands Management Act of 1996 to reauthorize for FY2017-FY2023 the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Historic Preservation Fund Grant Program.