There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

America's College Promise Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide greater access to higher education for America's students.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/08/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
07/08/2015Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/08/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (111)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/08/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 07/08/2015
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/08/2015
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 07/08/2015
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 07/29/2015
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/29/2015
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/29/2015
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/29/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/25/2015
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/25/2015
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/25/2015
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/25/2015
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/06/2015
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 10/28/2015
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 10/28/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 10/28/2015
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/18/2015
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/18/2015
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 12/18/2015
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 12/18/2015
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/18/2015
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 12/18/2015
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/18/2015
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/09/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/11/2016
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 02/25/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/16/2016
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/18/2016
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 04/26/2016
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/13/2016
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/13/2016
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/14/2016
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/01/2016
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/01/2016
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/01/2016
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/01/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/06/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/06/2016
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/06/2016
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/06/2016
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/06/2016
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/06/2016
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/06/2016
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/06/2016
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/07/2016
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 07/07/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/14/2016
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34] 09/12/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/19/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/16/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce07/08/2015 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training11/16/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2962. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/08/2015)

America's College Promise Act of 2015

This bill authorizes the Department of Education (ED) to award grants to states and Indian tribes to waive tuition and fees at community colleges. To receive a grant, states and Indian tribes must agree to waive tuition and fees at all their community colleges and for all eligible students.

An eligible student is a first-time student who: (1) qualifies for resident tuition; (2) enrolls at least half-time; (3) maintains satisfactory academic progress; and (4) enrolls in an academic program with credits that are fully transferable to any public institution of higher education in the state or enrolls in a training program that leads to credentials in an in-demand industry.

The bill appropriates $1.4 billion in FY2016 and $79.7 billion over FY2016-FY2025 to make grants under this community college program.

This bill also authorizes ED to award grants to four-year historically black colleges and universities (HBCUs) and other minority-serving institutions (MSIs) to waive or reduce tuition and fees for up to 60 credits for low-income students.

HBCUs and MSIs that participate must: (1) enroll a student body that contains at least 35% low-income students; (2) maintain or adopt reforms and practices to improve completion rates and student outcomes; (3) set performance goals; and (4) execute an articulation agreement with community colleges, if accepting transfer students.

It appropriates $55 million for FY2016 and $10.1 billion over FY2016-FY2025 to make grants under this HBCU/MSI program.