There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Gullah/Geechee Cultural Heritage Act to extend the authorization for the Gullah/Geechee Cultural Heritage Corridor Commission.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
10/07/2016Became Public Law No: 114-233. (TXT | PDF)
10/07/2016Signed by President.
10/03/2016Presented to President.
09/29/2016Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6255)
09/06/2016By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 114-338.
07/14/2016Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report.
02/24/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H875)
02/24/2016Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-430.
07/09/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
10/07/2016Became Public Law No: 114-233. (TXT | PDF)
10/07/2016Signed by President.
10/03/2016HousePresented to President.
09/29/2016SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/29/2016SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6255)
09/06/2016SenateBy Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 114-338.
07/14/2016SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 573.
07/14/2016SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
07/13/2016SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
06/15/2016SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
02/25/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
02/24/2016-2:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/24/2016-2:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H875)
02/24/2016-1:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3004.
02/24/2016-1:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H875-876)
02/24/2016-1:54pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/24/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 327.
02/24/2016HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-430.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/03/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/03/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/02/2016HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/02/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
08/31/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/09/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
07/09/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/09/2015 Referred to
02/03/2016 Markup by
02/24/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-430
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands08/31/2015 Referred to
02/02/2016 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/25/2016 Referred to
07/13/2016 Markup by
07/14/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-338
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks06/15/2016 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.3004. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-233 (10/07/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill amends the Gullah/Geechee Cultural Heritage Act to extend the authorization for the Gullah/Geechee Cultural Heritage Corridor Commission through October 12, 2021.