Committees: H.R.3004 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/09/2015 Referred to
02/03/2016 Markup by
02/24/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-430
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands08/31/2015 Referred to
02/02/2016 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/25/2016 Referred to
07/13/2016 Markup by
07/14/2016 Reported by S. Rept. 114-338
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks06/15/2016 Hearings by