There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Enforce the Law for Sanctuary Cities Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Enforce the Law for Sanctuary Cities Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 241(i) of the Immigration and Nationality Act to deny assistance under such section to a State or political subdivision of a State that prohibits its officials from taking certain actions with respect to immigration.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/23/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 241 - 179 (Roll no. 466).(text: CR H5409)
07/09/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
07/24/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
07/23/2015-4:20pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 241 - 179 (Roll no. 466). (text: CR H5409)
07/23/2015-4:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2015-4:08pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 181 - 239 (Roll no. 465). (consideration: CR H5450-5451)
07/23/2015-3:41pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H5450)
07/23/2015-3:32pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions, pending reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to report the same back to the House forthwith with an amendment to ensure that the Attorney General may not reduce or eliminate any funding provided to a State, or a political subdivision of a State, if the Attorney General determines that the reduction or elimination would result in: (1) an increase in the overall crime rate, including an increase in domestic violence, sex trafficking, or crimes against children; or (2) a decrease in the number of trained law enforcement officers. Subsequently, the point of order was withdrawn.
07/23/2015-3:31pmHouseMr. Jeffries moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on the Judiciary. (consideration: CR H5449-5450; text: CR H5449)
07/23/2015-3:30pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H5449)
07/23/2015-2:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3009.
07/23/2015-2:17pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 3009 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
07/23/2015-2:17pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 370. (consideration: CR H5440-5451)
07/23/2015-2:17pmHouseRule H. Res. 370 passed House.
07/22/2015-7:11pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 370 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3009 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
07/10/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/09/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
07/09/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 07/09/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/13/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/13/2015
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/13/2015
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/13/2015
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/13/2015
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/13/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/13/2015
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/13/2015
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 07/13/2015
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/14/2015
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/14/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/15/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/20/2015
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/21/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/21/2015
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 07/21/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 07/21/2015
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 07/21/2015
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 07/21/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 07/21/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/22/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/22/2015
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/22/2015
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 07/22/2015
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 07/22/2015
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/22/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/22/2015
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/22/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/09/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security07/10/2015 Referred to
Senate Judiciary07/24/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3009. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (07/23/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Enforce the Law for Sanctuary Cities Act

(Sec. 2) Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to make a state or local subdivision ineligible for state criminal alien assistance program funding if it: (1) has in effect any law, policy, or procedure prohibiting or restricting communication with the Immigration and Naturalization Service or other government entity regarding an individual's citizenship or immigration status; or (2) prohibits state or local law enforcement officials from gathering information regarding an individual's citizenship or immigration status.

(Sec. 3) Withholds specified Department of Justice funds (for the State Criminal Alien Assistance Program, the Community-Oriented Policing Services program, and the Byrne JAG program) under parts Q and E of title I of the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 from such states or local subdivisions.