There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Establishing Mandatory Minimums for Illegal Reentry Act of 2015
Kate's Law

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to increase the penalties applicable to aliens who unlawfully reenter the United States after being removed.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/09/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/29/2015 Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: House Judiciary
07/09/2015 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/09/2015 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 07/09/2015
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 07/09/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 07/10/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 07/10/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/15/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/15/2015
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/15/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/15/2015
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/15/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/15/2015
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/15/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/15/2015
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/23/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/23/2015
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 07/23/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/23/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/23/2015
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 07/23/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/23/2015
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 07/23/2015
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/23/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/28/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 07/28/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/29/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/08/2015
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 09/08/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/10/2015
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/10/2015
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/16/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 09/17/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 10/01/2015
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 10/06/2015
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 03/07/2016
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/14/2016
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/11/2016
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/07/2016
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 07/13/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/09/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security07/29/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (4)

  • Border security and unlawful immigration
  • Criminal procedure and sentencing
  • Immigration status and procedures

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3011. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/09/2015)

Establishing Mandatory Minimums for Illegal Reentry Act of 2015 or Kate's Law

This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to increase penalties applicable to aliens who unlawfully reenter the United States after being removed.