There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Private Property Rights Protection Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect private property rights.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/09/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
07/29/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/09/2015Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/09/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 07/09/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/21/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/08/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/10/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/09/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice07/29/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3013.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3013. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/09/2015)

Private Property Rights Protection Act of 2015

Prohibits a state or political subdivision from exercising its power of eminent domain, or allowing the exercise of such power by delegation, over property to be used for economic development or over property that is used for economic development within seven years after that exercise, if the state or political subdivision receives federal economic development funds during any fiscal year in which the property is so used or intended to be used.

Prohibits the federal government from exercising its power of eminent domain for economic development.

Establishes a private cause of action for any private property owner or tenant who suffers injury as a result of a violation of this Act. Prohibits state immunity in federal or state court. Sets the statute of limitations at seven years.

Requires the Department of Justice (DOJ) to bring an action to enforce this Act in certain circumstances, but prohibits an action brought later than seven years following the conclusion of any condemnation proceedings.

Requires DOJ to disseminate to states and the public information on: (1) the rights of property owners and tenants under this Act, and (2) the federal laws under which federal economic development funds are distributed.

Prohibits the federal government, or a state or political subdivision receiving federal economic development funds during any fiscal year, from exercising the power of eminent domain over property of a religious or other nonprofit organization because of the organization's nonprofit or tax-exempt status or any related quality.

Directs DOJ, if a court determines that a violation of this Act has a disproportionately high impact on the poor or minorities, to make efforts to locate former owners and tenants to inform them of the violation and any possible remedies.