There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Securities and Exchange Commission Reporting Modernization Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Securities and Exchange Commission Reporting Modernization Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Securities and Exchange Commission Reporting Modernization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to repeal a certain reporting requirement of the Securities and Exchange Commission.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/16/2015 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8219)
11/16/2015 Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-337.
07/10/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
11/17/2015 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
11/16/2015-7:48pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/16/2015-7:48pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8219)
11/16/2015-7:43pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3032.
11/16/2015-7:43pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8219)
11/16/2015-7:43pm House Mr. Hensarling moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/16/2015 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 258.
11/16/2015 House Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-337.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/29/2015 House Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 58 - 0.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/29/2015 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/28/2015 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/10/2015 House Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
07/10/2015 House Introduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 07/10/2015
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 10/27/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services07/10/2015 Referred to
07/29/2015 Markup by
11/16/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-337
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs11/17/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.3032.

Subjects (6)

  • Bank accounts, deposits, capital
  • Banking and financial institutions regulation
  • Congressional oversight
  • Right of privacy
  • Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)

Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3032. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/16/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Securities and Exchange Commission Reporting Modernization Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to repeal the requirement that the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) compile an annual tabulation of the occasions on which it has used specified law, including the Right to Financial Privacy Act of 1978, to obtain access to financial records of a customer and include it in its annual report to the Congress.

(The specified law referred to is the authority of the SEC to gain access to and obtain copies of, or the information contained in, financial records of a customer from a financial institution without prior notice to the customer upon an ex parte showing to an appropriate U.S. district court that the SEC seeks such records pursuant to a subpena, if certain circumstances exist and certain requirements are met.)