There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

READ Act
Research Excellence and Advancements for Dyslexia Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

READ Act
Research Excellence and Advancements for Dyslexia Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

READ Act
Research Excellence and Advancements for Dyslexia Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the President's annual budget request to Congress each year to include a line item for the Research in Disabilities Education program of the National Science Foundation and to require the National Science Foundation to conduct research on dyslexia.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
02/18/2016 Became Public Law No: 114-124. (TXT | PDF)
02/18/2016 Signed by President.
02/10/2016 Presented to President.
02/04/2016 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H584)
02/03/2016 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
02/03/2016 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S632)
10/26/2015 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7184)
07/13/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
02/18/2016 Became Public Law No: 114-124. (TXT | PDF)
02/18/2016 Signed by President.
02/10/2016 House Presented to President.
02/04/2016-12:21pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/04/2016-12:21pm House On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H584)
02/04/2016-12:21pm House Mr. Smith (TX) asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H584)
02/04/2016 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
02/03/2016 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
02/03/2016 Senate S.Amdt.3279 Amendment SA 3279 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
02/03/2016 Senate S.Amdt.3279 Amendment SA 3279 proposed by Senator Murkowski for Senator Lee. (consideration: CR S632; text: CR S632)
02/03/2016 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S632)
02/03/2016 Senate Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S632)
10/27/2015 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
10/26/2015-8:09pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/26/2015-8:09pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7184)
10/26/2015-7:45pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3033.
10/26/2015-7:45pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7184-7187)
10/26/2015-7:45pm House Mr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/08/2015 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
10/08/2015 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
07/13/2015 House Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
07/13/2015 House Introduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology07/13/2015 Referred to
10/08/2015 Markup by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions10/27/2015 Referred to
02/03/2016 Discharged from

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.3033.

Subjects (10)

  • Disability and paralysis
  • Education programs funding
  • Elementary and secondary education
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Language arts
  • National Science Foundation
  • Research administration and funding
  • Science and engineering education
  • Teaching, teachers, curricula

Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3033. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-124 (02/18/2016)

Research Excellence and Advancements for Dyslexia Act or the READ Act

(Sec. 3) This bill requires the National Science Foundation (NSF) to include in its annual congressional budget justification the amount requested for its Research in Disabilities Education program, which advances the goal of broadening the participation and achievement of learners with disabilities in science, technology, engineering, and mathematics.

(Sec. 4) Subject to the availability of appropriations, NSF must devote specified funding to support research on learning disabilities, including dyslexia, with the goal of practical application.