Text: H.R.308 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Reported in House (04/29/2015)

Union Calendar No. 67

114th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 308

[Report No. 114–95]


To prohibit gaming activities on certain Indian lands in Arizona until the expiration of certain gaming compacts.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

January 13, 2015

Mr. Franks of Arizona (for himself, Mrs. Kirkpatrick, Mr. Gosar, Mr. Schweikert, and Mr. Salmon) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Natural Resources

April 29, 2015

Additional sponsors: Ms. McCollum, Mr. Kildee, and Mr. Conyers

April 29, 2015

Committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered to be printed


A BILL

To prohibit gaming activities on certain Indian lands in Arizona until the expiration of certain gaming compacts.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Keep the Promise Act of 2015”.

SEC. 2. Findings.

The Congress finds as follows:

(1) In 2002, the voters in the State of Arizona approved Proposition 202, the Indian Gaming Preservation and Self-Reliance Act.

(2) To obtain the support of Arizona voters to approve Proposition 202, the Indian tribes within Arizona agreed to limit the number of casinos within the State and in particular within the Phoenix metropolitan area.

(3) This Act preserves the agreement made between the tribes and the Arizona voters until the expiration of the gaming compacts authorized by Proposition 202.

SEC. 3. Definitions.

For the purposes of this Act—

(1) the terms “Indian tribe”, “class II gaming”, and “class III gaming” have the meanings given those terms in section 4 of the Indian Gaming Regulatory Act (25 U.S.C. 2703); and

(2) the term “Phoenix metropolitan area” means land within Maricopa County and Pinal County, Arizona, that is north of latitude 33 degrees, 5 minutes, 13 seconds north, east of longitude 113 degrees, 20 minutes, 0 seconds west, and west of longitude 110 degrees, 50 minutes, 45 seconds west, using the NED 1983 State Plane Arizona FOPS 0202 coordinate system.

SEC. 4. Gaming clarification.

(a) Prohibition.—Class II gaming and class III gaming are prohibited on land within the Phoenix metropolitan area acquired by the Secretary of the Interior in trust for the benefit of an Indian tribe after April 9, 2013.

(b) Expiration.—The prohibition in subsection (a) shall expire on January 1, 2027.


Union Calendar No. 67

114th CONGRESS
     1st Session
H. R. 308
[Report No. 114–95]

A BILL
To prohibit gaming activities on certain Indian lands in Arizona until the expiration of certain gaming compacts.

April 29, 2015
Committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union and ordered to be printed