There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Thoroughbred Horseracing Integrity Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve the integrity and safety of Thoroughbred horseracing by requiring a uniform anti-doping program to be developed and enforced by an independent Thoroughbred Horseracing Anti-Doping Authority.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/16/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
07/17/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/16/2015Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (88)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 07/23/2015
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/23/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/23/2015
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 07/23/2015
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/23/2015
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/11/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/16/2015
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/16/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/16/2015
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/17/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/01/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/01/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/07/2015
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/28/2015
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/09/2015
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 12/10/2015
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 12/17/2015
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 12/18/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 01/06/2016
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 02/11/2016
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/12/2016
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 02/25/2016
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 02/25/2016
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/15/2016
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/17/2016
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/17/2016
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/23/2016
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/23/2016
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/12/2016
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 04/12/2016
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/12/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/12/2016
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/21/2016
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/27/2016
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/11/2016
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 05/11/2016
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/11/2016
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/12/2016
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/25/2016
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/31/2016
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/15/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/15/2016
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/16/2016
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/16/2016
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/16/2016
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 06/24/2016
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 06/24/2016
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 07/06/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 07/06/2016
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/14/2016
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/14/2016
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/14/2016
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 09/06/2016
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/06/2016
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/06/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/12/2016
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/12/2016
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 09/12/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 09/15/2016
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/15/2016
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/15/2016
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/15/2016
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 09/21/2016
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/21/2016
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/21/2016
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/26/2016
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/26/2016
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 09/26/2016
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 09/26/2016
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 09/28/2016
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/28/2016
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/28/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/28/2016
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 09/28/2016
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/16/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/16/2016
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/16/2016
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/16/2016
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 11/16/2016
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 11/16/2016
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/16/2016
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/02/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 12/02/2016
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 12/02/2016
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 12/07/2016
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/07/2016
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 12/13/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/16/2015 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade07/17/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3084.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3084. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/16/2015)

Thoroughbred Horseracing Integrity Act of 2015

Establishes the Thoroughbred Horseracing Anti-Doping Authority as an independent organization with responsibility for developing and administering an anti-doping program for Thoroughbred horses (covered horses), the trainers, owners, veterinarians, and employees of such persons and other personnel who are engaged in the care, training, or racing of such horses (covered persons), and horseraces that involve only Thoroughbreds and that are the subject of interstate off-track wagers (covered horseraces). Grants the Authority exclusive jurisdiction for anti-doping matters over all covered horses, persons, and horseraces, effective January 1, 2017.

Imposes the jurisdiction and authority of the Authority as conditions upon the privilege to accept, receive, or transmit wagers on, and to participate in, covered horseraces. Vests the Authority with the same powers over Thoroughbred horseracing licensees as the state racing commissions have.

Directs the Authority to develop and administer the Thoroughbred horseracing anti-doping program, which shall include:

  • lists of permitted and prohibited substances and methods;
  • a schedule of sanctions for violations;
  • programs relating to anti-doping research and education;
  • testing procedures, standards, and protocols for in-competition and out-of-competition testing;
  • procedures for investigating, charging, and adjudicating violations and for the enforcement of sanctions for violations; and
  • laboratory standards for accreditation and testing requirements, procedures, and protocols.

Conditions eligibility to participate in covered horseraces on covered persons agreeing that they and their covered horses shall be bound by the provisions of the program.

Directs the Authority to establish: (1) a list of anti-doping rule violations applicable to either horses or covered persons; (2) standards of accreditation for laboratories involved in the testing of samples taken from Thoroughbred horses, the process for achieving and maintaining accreditation, and the standards and protocols for testing of samples; (3) rules for anti-doping results management and the disciplinary process for anti-doping rule violations; and (4) uniform rules imposing sanctions against covered persons and/or covered horses for anti-doping rule violations.

Requires funds for the establishment and administration of the anti-doping program to be paid by the Thoroughbred horseracing industry.