There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3094. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (12/08/2016)

Gulf States Red Snapper Management Authority Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act to direct the National Marine Fisheries Service (NMFS) to establish a Gulf States Red Snapper Management Authority (GSRSMA) that consists of the principal fisheries manager of each of the five Gulf of Mexico coastal states: Alabama, Florida, Louisiana, Mississippi, and Texas. The GSRSMA must:

  • establish a deadline for each Gulf coastal state to submit to the GSRSMA a fishery management plan for the long-term sustainability of Gulf of Mexico red snapper,
  • review those plans and approve them if they meet the requirements of this bill,
  • provide standards for each Gulf coastal state to use in developing fishery management measures to sustainably manage the Gulf of Mexico red snapper in the coastal waters adjacent to the state, and
  • provide an opportunity for public participation before approving a plan.

For three years, the NMFS must continue to manage the commercial sector of the Gulf of Mexico red snapper fishery in coordination with the Gulf of Mexico Fishery Management Council.

The bill establishes a plan certification process. After the three-year period and once a plan is certified, the NMFS must transfer management of the Gulf of Mexico red snapper to the GSRSMA. Each Gulf coastal state must then implement and enforce approved plans for the fishery in the coastal waters adjacent to it.

If the Gulf of Mexico red snapper in the coastal waters adjacent to a Gulf coastal state is experiencing overfishing or is subject to a rebuilding plan, the state must certify to the GSRSMA that it has implemented the necessary measures to end overfishing or rebuild the fishery and has implemented a harvest monitoring program. A process is established for closing a red snapper fishery within the waters adjacent to the state territorial waters of the Gulf coastal state if those measures have not been implemented.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/08/2016 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-851.
07/16/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
12/08/2016 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 664.
12/08/2016 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-851.
Action By: House Natural Resources
06/15/2016 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 14.
Action By: House Natural Resources
06/15/2016 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. Markup report CQ
Action By: House Natural Resources
06/14/2016 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. Markup report CQ
Action By: House Natural Resources
06/14/2016 House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged.
Action By: House Natural Resources
03/03/2016 Senate Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 114-604.
Action By: Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship
10/22/2015 House Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans
08/04/2015 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: House Natural Resources
07/16/2015 House Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
07/16/2015 House Introduced in House

Titles (3)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House:

Gulf States Red Snapper Management Authority Act

Short Titles as Introduced:

Gulf States Red Snapper Management Authority Act

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To amend the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act to transfer to States the authority to manage red snapper fisheries in the Gulf of Mexico.


Subjects (11)

  • Alabama
  • Fishes
  • Florida
  • Gulf of Mexico
  • Intergovernmental relations
  • Louisiana
  • Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
  • Mississippi
  • State and local government operations
  • Texas

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/16/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/29/2015
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/30/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 09/30/2015
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 10/07/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 10/07/2015
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 10/09/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 11/16/2015
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/25/2016
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/12/2016
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/12/2016
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/26/2016
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 06/08/2016
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/08/2016
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 06/08/2016
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/10/2016
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/10/2016
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/10/2016
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 06/10/2016
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/10/2016
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 06/13/2016
Rep. Hardy, Cresent [R-NV-4] 06/14/2016
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Sponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/21/2015 12/10/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/16/2015 Referred to
06/15/2016 Markup by
12/08/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-851
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans08/04/2015 Referred to
10/22/2015 Hearings by
06/14/2016 Discharged from
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship03/03/2016 Hearings by

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.3094.