There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

RAISE Family Caregivers Act
Recognize, Assist, Include, Support, and Engage Family Caregivers Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the establishment and maintenance of a National Family Caregiving Strategy, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/16/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
07/16/2015Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (127)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 07/16/2015
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 09/08/2015
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 09/24/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/01/2015
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/01/2015
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 10/01/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 10/01/2015
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/06/2015
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 10/07/2015
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 10/07/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/09/2015
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/20/2015
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/20/2015
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 11/02/2015
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/05/2015
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/05/2015
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 12/08/2015
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/08/2015
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 12/16/2015
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/16/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/16/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/17/2015
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/17/2015
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/18/2015
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/05/2016
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 01/05/2016
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 01/12/2016
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/12/2016
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/02/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 02/02/2016
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/04/2016
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/04/2016
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/04/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 02/04/2016
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/10/2016
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 02/10/2016
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/10/2016
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/12/2016
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/24/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/24/2016
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/26/2016
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/26/2016
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 02/26/2016
Rep. Ashford, Brad [D-NE-2] 02/26/2016
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/01/2016
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/02/2016
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/02/2016
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 03/02/2016
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 03/15/2016
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 03/15/2016
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/15/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/22/2016
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/12/2016
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/12/2016
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 04/12/2016
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/12/2016
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 04/12/2016
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/14/2016
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/18/2016
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 05/10/2016
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/10/2016
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/10/2016
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/16/2016
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/24/2016
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/08/2016
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/08/2016
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 06/08/2016
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 06/08/2016
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/09/2016
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 06/09/2016
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 06/09/2016
Rep. Takai, Mark [D-HI-1] 06/09/2016
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/09/2016
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/09/2016
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/09/2016
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/10/2016
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/10/2016
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/10/2016
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/14/2016
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/14/2016
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/14/2016
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/15/2016
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/15/2016
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/15/2016
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/06/2016
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 07/06/2016
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 07/06/2016
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 07/06/2016
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/06/2016
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/06/2016
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/06/2016
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/06/2016
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 07/08/2016
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/08/2016
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/14/2016
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/06/2016
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/06/2016
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/06/2016
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 09/06/2016
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/06/2016
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 09/06/2016
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 09/06/2016
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 09/06/2016
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 09/06/2016
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/06/2016
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/08/2016
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/08/2016
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/08/2016
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/08/2016
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/08/2016
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/09/2016
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/09/2016
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/09/2016
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/09/2016
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 09/13/2016
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/13/2016
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/13/2016
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/13/2016
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/13/2016
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/15/2016
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/15/2016
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/21/2016
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/27/2016
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/28/2016
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/14/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce07/16/2015 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education11/16/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3099. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/16/2015)

Recognize, Assist, Include, Support, and Engage Family Caregivers Act of 2015 or the RAISE Family Caregivers Act

This bill directs the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to develop, maintain, and periodically update a National Family Caregiving Strategy.

HHS shall convene a Family Caregiving Advisory Council to advise it on recognizing and supporting family caregivers.

Federal departments and agencies must share with HHS any data they maintain that HHS needs to prepare the initial and updated Strategies.