There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Enhancing Safety at Military Installations Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To safeguard military and civilian personnel on military bases and Armed Forces recruitment facilities by repealing bans on military personnel carrying firearms on military bases and recruitment facilities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/20/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
09/08/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/20/2015Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/20/2015Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/20/2015Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/20/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/20/2015
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/20/2015
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/20/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 07/20/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 07/20/2015
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 07/20/2015
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/20/2015
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 07/20/2015
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 07/20/2015
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 07/20/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 07/21/2015
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/21/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 07/21/2015
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 07/21/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/21/2015
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/21/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/21/2015
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 07/22/2015
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/22/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 07/22/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/22/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/22/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 07/22/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 07/22/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/22/2015
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/22/2015
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 07/22/2015
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/22/2015
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 07/22/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/22/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/22/2015
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/22/2015
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 07/22/2015
Rep. Hardy, Cresent [R-NV-4] 07/22/2015
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 07/22/2015
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/22/2015
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 07/22/2015
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/22/2015
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/22/2015
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/22/2015
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/22/2015
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/23/2015
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/23/2015
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/23/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/23/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/23/2015
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/23/2015
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 07/28/2015
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/28/2015
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/28/2015
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 07/28/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/28/2015
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/28/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 07/28/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/28/2015
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 07/28/2015
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/28/2015
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/28/2015
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/28/2015
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/28/2015
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 07/28/2015
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/29/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/29/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/29/2015
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 07/29/2015
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/31/2015
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/31/2015
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 07/31/2015
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 08/04/2015
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 08/04/2015
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/11/2015
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/18/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services07/20/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary07/20/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations09/08/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3115.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3115. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/20/2015)

Enhancing Safety at Military Installations Act

This bill directs the Department of Defense (DOD) to issue a new directive authorizing trained military personnel to carry military-issued firearms on military bases and Armed Forces recruitment facilities.

Army Regulation 190-14, entitled "Carrying of Firearms and Use of Force for Law Enforcement and Security Duties," and DOD Directive Number 5210.56, entitled "Use of Deadly Force and the Carrying of Firearms by DOD Personnel Engaged in Law Enforcement and Security Duties" are repealed.

Any provision in any other law, rule, regulation, or executive order that prohibits trained military personnel from carrying officially issued firearms on military bases and Armed Forces recruitment facilities shall have no force or effect.

Trained military personnel shall not be prohibited from carrying officially issued firearms on military bases or Armed Forces recruitment facilities.