There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

SEMPER FI Act
Securing Military Personnel Response Firearm Initiative Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve security at Armed Forces recruitment centers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/21/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/21/2015Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/21/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 07/21/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 07/22/2015
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 07/22/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/22/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/23/2015
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/23/2015
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/23/2015
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/23/2015
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/23/2015
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/28/2015
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 07/28/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 07/28/2015
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/28/2015
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 07/28/2015
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/28/2015
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/28/2015
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/28/2015
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/28/2015
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 07/29/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/31/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 07/31/2015
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 07/31/2015
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 09/08/2015
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/08/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/08/2015
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/08/2015
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/08/2015
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/08/2015
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 09/08/2015
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 05/18/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services07/21/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3139. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/21/2015)

Securing Military Personnel Response Firearm Initiative Act or SEMPER FI Act

This bill directs the Secretary concerned to authorize an eligible member of the Armed Forces assigned to an Armed Forces recruitment center to carry a service-issue sidearm as a personal- or force-protection measure while on duty at the recruiting center, notwithstanding any federal, state, or local law or Department of Defense policy to the contrary.

In lieu of authorizing eligible members of the Armed Forces to carry a service-issue sidearm, or in addition, the Secretary concerned may implement additional security measures for Armed Forces recruitment centers, including improved structural security measures.

This Act shall not be interpreted to grant any member of the Armed Forces the authority to conduct civilian law enforcement functions within U.S. territory.