There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Strengthening Transparency in Higher Education Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Strengthening Transparency in Higher Education Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To simplify and streamline the information regarding institutions of higher education made publicly available by the Secretary of Education, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/11/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4603-4605)
07/11/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 114-674.
07/23/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/12/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
07/11/2016-4:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/11/2016-4:23pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4603-4605)
07/11/2016-4:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3178.
07/11/2016-4:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4603-4606)
07/11/2016-4:14pmHouseMr. Messer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/11/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 522.
07/11/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 114-674.
06/22/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
06/22/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
11/16/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
07/23/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
07/23/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (25)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce07/23/2015 Referred to
06/22/2016 Markup by
07/11/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-674
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training11/16/2015 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/12/2016 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3178.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3178. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/11/2016)

Strengthening Transparency in Higher Education Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends title I (General Provisions) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 to modify consumer information disclosure requirements related to college costs and student characteristics.

Specifically, it eliminates the existing restriction that limits calculations of cost of attendance, net price, and tuition and fees to first time students only.

Additionally, it eliminates provisions that require the Department of Education (ED) to make publicly available the following: (1) college affordability and transparency lists, (2) annual summaries of institutional reports, (3) state higher education spending charts; and (4) a multi-year tuition and fees calculator.

(Sec. 3) The bill directs ED to develop, annually update, and make publicly available a College Dashboard website to replace the College Navigator website.

It revises the consumer information ED must make publicly available regarding an institution that participates in federal student aid programs under title IV (Student Assistance). ED must also publish and link to the College Dashboard website additional information regarding student enrollment, completion rates, costs, use of financial aid, and faculty.

The bill establishes certain minimum requirements for an institution's net price calculator, including website location and information provided. Sale or distribution of personally identifiable information collected by a net price calculator is prohibited.

(Sec. 4) No additional funds are authorized to carry out the requirements of this bill.