There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Empowering Students Through Enhanced Financial Counseling Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Empowering Students Through Enhanced Financial Counseling Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the loan counseling requirements under the Higher Education Act of 1965, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/11/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4607-4609)
07/11/2016Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 114-675.
07/23/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/12/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
07/11/2016-4:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/11/2016-4:44pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4607-4609)
07/11/2016-4:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3179.
07/11/2016-4:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4607-4611)
07/11/2016-4:33pmHouseMr. Guthrie moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/11/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 523.
07/11/2016HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 114-675.
06/22/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
06/22/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
11/16/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
07/23/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
07/23/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 07/23/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/29/2015
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/29/2015
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/11/2015
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 09/29/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 09/29/2015
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 11/02/2015
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/04/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 12/10/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/10/2015
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/15/2015
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/03/2016
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/10/2016
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 06/21/2016
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/21/2016
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/08/2016
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/08/2016
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/08/2016
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/08/2016
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 07/08/2016
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/08/2016

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce07/23/2015 Referred to
06/22/2016 Markup by
07/11/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-675
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training11/16/2015 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/12/2016 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3179. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/11/2016)

Empowering Students Through Enhanced Financial Counseling Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends title IV (Student Assistance) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 to modify loan counseling requirements for an institution of higher education (IHE) that participates in federal student aid programs.

Currently, an IHE must provide entrance counseling to a student who is a first-time federal student loan borrower. This bill replaces required entrance counseling with required annual counseling. Also, it expands the required recipients of such annual counseling to include, in addition to student borrowers, Federal Pell Grant recipients and parent PLUS Loan borrowers.

Each annual counseling recipient must receive comprehensive information on the terms, conditions, and responsibilities with respect to a grant or loan and general information on a typical student budget, the right to request an annual credit report, average income and employment data, and financial management resources. Additionally, the bill revises, expands, or establishes specific annual counseling information requirements for student borrowers, Pell Grant recipients, or parent PLUS Loan borrowers.

(Sec. 3) The legislation revises and expands exit counseling information requirements to include an outstanding loan balance summary, the anticipated monthly payments under standard and income-based repayment plans, an explanation of the grace period preceding repayment, the option to pay accrued interest before it capitalizes, the right to request an annual credit report, and loan servicer contact information.

(Sec. 4) It directs ED to maintain a consumer-tested online counseling tool that provides annual and exit counseling.

(Sec. 5) The Institute of Education Sciences must study the impact and effectiveness of exit counseling, annual counseling, and the online counseling tool.

(Sec. 6) No additional funds are authorized to carry out the requirements of this bill.