There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Flexible Pell Grant for 21st Century Students Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to provide students with increased flexibility in the use of Federal Pell Grants, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/23/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
11/16/2015Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
07/23/2015Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/2015Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 07/23/2015
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 07/23/2015
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/29/2015
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/29/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 07/29/2015
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 07/29/2015
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/29/2015
Rep. Jolly, David W. [R-FL-13] 07/31/2015
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/31/2015
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/08/2015
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 09/22/2015
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 09/30/2015
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 10/13/2015
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 10/21/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/21/2015
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 10/26/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 11/30/2015
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/03/2015
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 12/10/2015
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 12/16/2015
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/16/2015
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/16/2015
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 12/16/2015
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/01/2016
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 02/08/2016
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 02/10/2016
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 02/10/2016
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/10/2016
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/12/2016
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/29/2016
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/01/2016
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/07/2016
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 03/15/2016
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/15/2016
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 04/13/2016
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 05/10/2016
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 05/10/2016
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/10/2016
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/17/2016
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/27/2016
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/08/2016
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 09/07/2016
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/08/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce07/23/2015 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training11/16/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3180.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3180. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/23/2015)

Flexible Pell Grant for 21st Century Students Act

This bill amends title IV (Student Assistance) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 to allow an eligible student to receive more than one Federal Pell Grant award in a single award year.

An eligible student is a student who: (1) has already received a Pell Grant during an award year and is enrolled in an eligible program for one or more additional payment periods (e.g., a summer term) during the same award year, (2) continues to meet Pell Grant program eligibility requirements, and (3) is accelerating progress toward a degree or certificate.

An eligible student's total Pell Grant amount must not exceed 150% of the annual maximum Pell Grant for that award year.

An institution must notify a student that any period of additional Pell Grant receipt counts toward that student's lifetime Pell Grant eligibility period (currently 12 full-time semesters). If an additional Pell Grant spans two award years, then an institution must determine the award year to which such Pell Grant applies.

The Department of Education must provide to each Pell Grant recipient an annual status report that includes certain information related to such student's remaining lifetime Pell Grant eligibility period.