There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 55 Grasso Plaza in St. Louis, Missouri, as the "Sgt. Amanda N. Pinson Post Office".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/05/2015Became Public Law No: 114-77. (TXT | PDF)
11/05/2015Signed by President.
10/26/2015Presented to President.
10/20/2015Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7366)
10/08/2015Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
09/24/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6202)
01/13/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
11/05/2015Became Public Law No: 114-77. (TXT | PDF)
11/05/2015Signed by President.
10/26/2015HousePresented to President.
10/21/2015SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/20/2015SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7366)
10/08/2015SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 257.
10/08/2015SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
10/07/2015SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
09/25/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/24/2015-2:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/24/2015-2:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6202)
09/24/2015-1:54pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 323.
09/24/2015-1:54pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6202-6203)
09/24/2015-1:54pmHouseMr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/23/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
01/13/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
01/13/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform01/13/2015 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/25/2015 Referred to
10/07/2015 Markup by
10/08/2015 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.323.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.323. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 114-77 (11/05/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 55 Grasso Plaza in St. Louis, Missouri, as the "Sgt. Amanda N. Pinson Post Office."