There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Federal Intern Protection Act of 2016

Short Titles as Reported to House

Federal Intern Protection Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Intern Protection Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 5, United States Code, to protect unpaid interns in the Federal Government from workplace harassment and discrimination, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5, United States Code, to protect unpaid interns in the Federal government from workplace harassment and discrimination, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
01/11/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 35).(text: CR H255)
12/18/2015Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-383.
07/28/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/07/2016SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 616.
09/06/2016SenateRead the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
01/12/2016SenateReceived in the Senate.
01/11/2016-7:01pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
01/11/2016-7:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 0 (Roll no. 35). (text: CR H255)
01/11/2016-7:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/11/2016-6:54pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H258)
01/11/2016-5:55pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
01/11/2016-5:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3231.
01/11/2016-5:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H255-257)
01/11/2016-5:36pmHouseMr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/18/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 289.
12/18/2015HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-383.
10/09/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
10/09/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
07/28/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
07/28/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/28/2015
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 07/28/2015
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/29/2015

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform07/28/2015 Referred to
10/09/2015 Markup by
12/18/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-383

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3231. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (01/11/2016)

Federal Intern Protection Act of 2016

(Sec. 2) This bill extends protections against discrimination in a federal workplace based on race, color, religion, sex, national origin, age, or disability to interns (individuals who perform uncompensated voluntary service in a federal agency to earn credit awarded by an educational institution or to learn a trade or occupation) and applicants for internships.