Text: H.R.3231 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (09/07/2016)

Calendar No. 616

114th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 3231


To amend title 5, United States Code, to protect unpaid interns in the Federal Government from workplace harassment and discrimination, and for other purposes.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

January 12, 2016

Received

September 6, 2016

Read the first time

September 7, 2016

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To amend title 5, United States Code, to protect unpaid interns in the Federal Government from workplace harassment and discrimination, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Federal Intern Protection Act of 2016”.

SEC. 2. Prohibited personnel practices.

(a) In general.—Section 2302 of title 5, United States Code, is amended by adding at the end the following:

“(g) (1) All protections afforded to an employee under subparagraphs (A), (B), and (D) of subsection (b)(1) shall be afforded, in the same manner and to the same extent, to an intern and an applicant for internship.

“(2) For purposes of the application of this subsection, a reference to an employee shall be considered a reference to an intern in—

“(A) section 717 of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 (42 U.S.C. 2000e–16);

“(B) sections 12 and 15 of the Age Discrimination in Employment Act of 1967 (29 U.S.C. 631, 633a); and

“(C) section 501 of the Rehabilitation Act of 1973 (29 U.S.C. 791).

“(3) In this subsection, the term ‘intern’ means an individual who performs uncompensated voluntary service in an agency to earn credit awarded by an educational institution or to learn a trade or occupation.”.

(b) Conforming amendment.—Section 3111(c)(1) of title 5, United States Code, is amended by inserting “section 2302(g) (relating to prohibited personnel practices),” before “chapter 81”.

Passed the House of Representatives January 11, 2016.

Attest:
Karen L. Haas,

Clerk  


Calendar No. 616

114th CONGRESS
     2d Session
H. R. 3231

AN ACT
To amend title 5, United States Code, to protect unpaid interns in the Federal Government from workplace harassment and discrimination, and for other purposes.

September 7, 2016
Read the second time and placed on the calendar