Text: H.R.3231 — 114th Congress (2015-2016)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (09/07/2016)

 
[Congressional Bills 114th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H.R. 3231 Placed on Calendar Senate (PCS)]

<DOC>





                                                       Calendar No. 616
114th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                H. R. 3231


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                            January 12, 2016

                                Received

                           September 6, 2016

                          Read the first time

                           September 7, 2016

            Read the second time and placed on the calendar

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT


 
To amend title 5, United States Code, to protect unpaid interns in the 
 Federal Government from workplace harassment and discrimination, and 
                          for other purposes.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Federal Intern Protection Act of 
2016''.

SEC. 2. PROHIBITED PERSONNEL PRACTICES.

    (a) In General.--Section 2302 of title 5, United States Code, is 
amended by adding at the end the following:
    ``(g)(1) All protections afforded to an employee under 
subparagraphs (A), (B), and (D) of subsection (b)(1) shall be afforded, 
in the same manner and to the same extent, to an intern and an 
applicant for internship.
    ``(2) For purposes of the application of this subsection, a 
reference to an employee shall be considered a reference to an intern 
in--
            ``(A) section 717 of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 (42 
        U.S.C. 2000e-16);
            ``(B) sections 12 and 15 of the Age Discrimination in 
        Employment Act of 1967 (29 U.S.C. 631, 633a); and
            ``(C) section 501 of the Rehabilitation Act of 1973 (29 
        U.S.C. 791).
    ``(3) In this subsection, the term `intern' means an individual who 
performs uncompensated voluntary service in an agency to earn credit 
awarded by an educational institution or to learn a trade or 
occupation.''.
    (b) Conforming Amendment.--Section 3111(c)(1) of title 5, United 
States Code, is amended by inserting ``section 2302(g) (relating to 
prohibited personnel practices),'' before ``chapter 81''.

            Passed the House of Representatives January 11, 2016.

            Attest:

                                                 KAREN L. HAAS,

                                                                 Clerk.
                                                       Calendar No. 616

114th CONGRESS

  2d Session

                               H. R. 3231

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT

To amend title 5, United States Code, to protect unpaid interns in the 
 Federal Government from workplace harassment and discrimination, and 
                          for other purposes.

_______________________________________________________________________

                           September 7, 2016

            Read the second time and placed on the calendar

Share This