There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Resettlement Accountability National Security Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To suspend the admission into the United States of refugees in order to examine the costs of providing benefits to such individuals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/29/2015 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/08/2015 Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/29/2015 Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/29/2015 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (86)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/15/2015
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 09/15/2015
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/15/2015
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/15/2015
Rep. Zinke, Ryan K. [R-MT-At Large] 09/15/2015
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/15/2015
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 09/15/2015
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 09/15/2015
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/16/2015
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/17/2015
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/22/2015
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/22/2015
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/22/2015
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 10/01/2015
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 10/01/2015
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 10/01/2015
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/01/2015
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/01/2015
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 10/01/2015
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/07/2015
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 10/07/2015
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/08/2015
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/20/2015
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/20/2015
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 10/21/2015
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/21/2015
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/21/2015
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 10/22/2015
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/22/2015
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 10/27/2015
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 10/27/2015
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 10/27/2015
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 10/27/2015
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/28/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 10/28/2015
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/02/2015
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/02/2015
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/03/2015
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 11/03/2015
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 11/03/2015
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/03/2015
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 11/04/2015
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/04/2015
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 11/04/2015
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 11/04/2015
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 11/04/2015
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/16/2015
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/16/2015
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 11/16/2015
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/16/2015
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/16/2015
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/16/2015
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 11/16/2015
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/16/2015
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 11/16/2015
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 11/16/2015
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 11/16/2015
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/16/2015
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 11/16/2015
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/16/2015
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 11/17/2015
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 11/17/2015
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 11/17/2015
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 11/17/2015
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 11/17/2015
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 11/17/2015
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 11/17/2015
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 11/17/2015
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 11/17/2015
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/17/2015
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/17/2015
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/17/2015
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/17/2015
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/17/2015
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 11/18/2015
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/18/2015
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 11/18/2015
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 11/18/2015
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 11/19/2015
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 11/30/2015
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 12/01/2015
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 12/03/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/11/2015
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 12/15/2015
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/22/2016
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 11/30/2016

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/29/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security09/08/2015 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (14)

  • Congressional oversight
  • Disability assistance
  • Employment taxes
  • Food assistance and relief
  • Government studies and investigations
  • Housing and community development funding
  • Immigrant health and welfare
  • Immigration status and procedures
  • Low- and moderate-income housing
  • Medicaid
  • Medicare
  • Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
  • Tax administration and collection, taxpayers

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3314. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/29/2015)

Resettlement Accountability National Security Act of 2015

This bill prohibits the admission of refugees into the United States until Congress passes a joint resolution giving the Department of Homeland Security authority to resume admitting refugees.

Requires the Government Accountability Office to report to Congress on refugees who received benefits under any of the following programs:

  • Medicare,
  • Medicaid,
  • disability insurance under title II of the Social Security Act,
  • the supplemental nutrition assistance program (SNAP, formerly the food stamp program), and
  • section 8 rental assistance.