There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Know the CBRN Terrorism Threats to Transportation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Know the CBRN Terrorism Threats to Transportation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require a terrorism threat assessment regarding the transportation of chemical, biological, nuclear, and radiological materials through United States land borders and within the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
10/20/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 0 (Roll no. 551).(text: CR H6989)
10/20/2015Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-296.
07/29/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/21/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
10/20/2015-7:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/20/2015-7:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 0 (Roll no. 551). (text: CR H6989)
10/20/2015-6:59pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7010-7011)
10/20/2015-4:35pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
10/20/2015-4:26pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3350.
10/20/2015-4:26pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6989-6991)
10/20/2015-4:26pmHouseMr. Donovan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/20/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 225.
10/20/2015HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-296.
09/30/2015HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/30/2015HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/17/2015HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence
09/17/2015HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence
08/11/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
07/29/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
07/29/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/29/2015
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 07/29/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security07/29/2015 Referred to
09/30/2015 Markup by
10/20/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-296
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence08/11/2015 Referred to
09/17/2015 Markup by
09/17/2015 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs10/21/2015 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3350.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3350. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (10/20/2015)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Know the CBRN Terrorism Threats to Transportation Act

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security, acting through the Under Secretary of Intelligence and Analysis, to conduct a terrorism threat assessment of the transportation of chemical, biological, nuclear, and radiological materials through U.S. land borders and within the United States.

The Under Secretary shall disseminate such assessment to federal partners, including the Department of Transportation and the Department of Energy, and state and local partners, including the National Network of Fusion Centers.