There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Kennesaw Mountain National Battlefield Park Boundary Adjustment Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

Kennesaw Mountain National Battlefield Park Boundary Adjustment Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Kennesaw Mountain National Battlefield Park Boundary Adjustment Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To adjust the boundary of the Kennesaw Mountain National Battlefield Park to include the Wallis House and Harriston Hill, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
02/24/2016Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H885)
02/24/2016Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-434.
07/29/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/17/2016SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 114-496.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
02/25/2016SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
02/24/2016-3:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/24/2016-3:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H885)
02/24/2016-2:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3371.
02/24/2016-2:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H884-886)
02/24/2016-2:55pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/24/2016HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 331.
02/24/2016HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-434.
02/03/2016HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/03/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/02/2016HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
02/02/2016HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
08/31/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/29/2015HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
07/29/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 07/29/2015
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/11/2015
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/17/2015

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources07/29/2015 Referred to
02/03/2016 Markup by
02/24/2016 Reported by H. Rept. 114-434
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands08/31/2015 Referred to
02/02/2016 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/25/2016 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks03/17/2016 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3371. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (02/24/2016)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Kennesaw Mountain National Battlefield Park Boundary Adjustment Act of 2015

(Sec. 3) This bill modifies the boundary of the Kennesaw Mountain National Battlefield Park in Georgia to include approximately eight acres identified as Wallis House and Harriston Hill.

The Department of the Interior may acquire land or interests, by donation or exchange, from willing owners only.

Interior shall administer acquired lands and interests as part of the Park.

The written consent of property owners is required before the land is included in the park. Interior may not acquire the land by condemnation.